AL SB324 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2014, from Insurance Department Fund to Department of Insurance, facilitate payment to City of Montgomery
Title
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2014, from Insurance Department Fund to Department of Insurance, facilitate payment to City of Montgomery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund with 2 amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Amendment Offered |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |