AL SB329 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal sentencing, new voluntary sentencing standards adopted, effective October 1, 2010, Sec. 12-25-34.2 added
Title
Criminal sentencing, new voluntary sentencing standards adopted, effective October 1, 2010, Sec. 12-25-34.2 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 804 | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |