AL SB33 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned Act No. 2018-419.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned Act No. 2018-419.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Policy, Permanent Joint Legislative Committee on, membership and duties revised, limit reporting of committee, creation of office deleted, authorized to form advisory subcommittees, Secs. 29-2-270 to 29-2-275, inclusive, am'd.
Title
Energy Policy, Permanent Joint Legislative Committee on, membership and duties revised, limit reporting of committee, creation of office deleted, authorized to form advisory subcommittees, Secs. 29-2-270 to 29-2-275, inclusive, am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-419. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on March 21, 2018 at 4:34 p.m. on March 21, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-21 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 945 |
2018-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar as Favorable |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 76 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 75 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ward Amendment Offered |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 74 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |