AL SB350 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on March 25, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on March 25, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Talladega Co., board of registrars, meeting days increased, Sec. 17-3-8 am'd.
Title
Talladega Co., board of registrars, meeting days increased, Sec. 17-3-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Preuitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned Act No. 2010-279. | |
2010-03-25 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-25 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 678 | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution and Elections | |
2010-02-18 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 309 | |
2010-02-18 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |