AL SB388 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Boards and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Boards and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Engineers and Land Surveyors, State Board of Licensure for Professional, licensure, graduation and experience qualifications, Sec. 34-11-4 am'd.
Title
Engineers and Land Surveyors, State Board of Licensure for Professional, licensure, graduation and experience qualifications, Sec. 34-11-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Boards and Commissions | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards and Commissions | |
2010-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1097 | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1096 | |
2010-04-14 | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2010-02-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |