AL SB388 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Assigned Act No. 2021-421.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Assigned Act No. 2021-421.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Daylight Savings Time, adopted statewide if Congress amends Federal law to allow
Title
Daylight Savings Time, adopted statewide if Congress amends Federal law to allow
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1151 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - HBIR: Whorton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1150 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1035 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Livingston motion to Adopt Roll Call 1034 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - HBIR: Whorton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1150 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1035 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Livingston motion to Adopt Roll Call 1034 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-421. |
2021-05-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-05-06 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2021-05-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1151 |
2021-05-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-29 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1035 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |