AL SB412 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Kyle Grady Act, possession and self-administration of auto-injectable epinephrine by students permitted, Sec. 16-1-39 am'd
Title
Kyle Grady Act, possession and self-administration of auto-injectable epinephrine by students permitted, Sec. 16-1-39 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Health | |
2012-05-10 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-26 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 814 | |
2012-04-26 | Whatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 813 | |
2012-04-26 | Health Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |