AR HR1004 | 2024 | 94th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-23 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-23 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize The Arkansas Committee Of The National Museum Of Women In The Arts For Thirty-five Years Of Creative Contributions To The Citizens Of Arkansas And Continuous Support Of Women Artists In Arkansas.
Title
To Recognize The Arkansas Committee Of The National Museum Of Women In The Arts For Thirty-five Years Of Creative Contributions To The Citizens Of Arkansas And Continuous Support Of Women Artists In Arkansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2024-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2024-04-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2024-04-02 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hr1004&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2024F |
Text | https://arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2024F%2FPublic%2FHR1004.pdf |