AR SB111 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Notification that SB111 is now Act 257
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Notification that SB111 is now Act 257
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | Notification that SB111 is now Act 257 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2014-03-04 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2014-03-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2014-02-21 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2014-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2014-02-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Amendment #2 withdrawn |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed |