AR SB57 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Notification that SB57 is now Act 235
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Notification that SB57 is now Act 235
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The University Of Central Arkansas Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The University Of Central Arkansas Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Notification that SB57 is now Act 235 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2014-03-05 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2014-03-05 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2014-03-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2014-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2014-02-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed |