AR SB79 | 2024 | 94th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Notification that SB79 is now Act 174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Notification that SB79 is now Act 174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Data Centers Act Of 2023; To Provide For The Regulation Of Digital Asset Mining Businesses; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Data Centers Act Of 2023; To Provide For The Regulation Of Digital Asset Mining Businesses; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Notification that SB79 is now Act 174 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2024-05-01 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2024-05-01 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-05-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2024-04-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2024-04-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2024-04-24 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Amendment #1 was withdrawn |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Filed |