AZ HB2010 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-08 - House ELECT Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-08 - House ELECT Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Collection; voted early ballots; limitation
Title
Collection; voted early ballots; limitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Held |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to House ELECT Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |