AZ HB2018 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Missing child; reporting; offense
Title
Missing child; reporting; offense
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] | Rep. John Fillmore [R] |
Rep. Tom Forese [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] | Sen. Michelle Ugenti-Rita [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-12 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-12 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-05-03 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-05-03 | Transmit to House | |
2012-05-03 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-1-3-0) | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-05-03 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-05-03 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-05-03 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-06 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-01-23 | House Consent Calendar January 23, 2012 @ 1:26 PM with Objections | |
2012-01-26 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-12 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-01-10 | House read second time | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced in House and read first time |