AZ HB2044 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Restitution; child survivors; DUI.
Title
Restitution; child survivors; DUI.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2024-02-27 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (18-40-1-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-01-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-17 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-12-11 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Child Survivors
Criminal Code - Title 13
Driving Under The Influence
Dui (see Also: Driving Under The Influence)
Restitution
Criminal Code - Title 13
Driving Under The Influence
Dui (see Also: Driving Under The Influence)
Restitution