AZ HB2060 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Chapter 174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Chapter 174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacists; providers; drug therapy; refills
Title
Pharmacists; providers; drug therapy; refills
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 174 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-04 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-24 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-01-11 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Arizona State Board Of Pharmacy
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Pharmacy Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Pharmacy Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1970 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1979.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |