AZ HB2066 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-16 - House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-16 - House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral health transportation; providers; technicians
Title
Behavioral health transportation; providers; technicians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-16 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | House | House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-12-19 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Behavioral Health Transportation
Duties
Emergency Medical Services
Ems
Providers
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rules
Technicians
Duties
Emergency Medical Services
Ems
Providers
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rules
Technicians
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 503.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |