AZ HB2088 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; assessments; surveys; informed consent
Title
Schools; assessments; surveys; informed consent
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] | Rep. Jill Norgaard [R] |
Rep. Tony Rivero [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Chapter 330 | |
2016-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-05 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-04 | House | House final reading , voting: (28-32-0-0) |
2016-05-04 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-7-1-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-24-2-0) |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0-0) |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |