AZ HB2088 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1125
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporation; urbanized areas
Title
Incorporation; urbanized areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Motion HB 2088 substituted for SB 1125. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - Motion Representative Allen moved that the House refer HB 2064 for Additional COW. Motion passed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - Motion Representative Allen moved that the House refer HB 2064 for Additional COW. Motion passed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Chapter 1 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2088 substituted for SB 1125. Motion carried. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-20-0-0) |
2017-02-07 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-06 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-01-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-30 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-01-30 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1125 (Replaces) 2017-02-16 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended