AZ HB2130 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Chapter 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Chapter 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recreational users; property
Title
Recreational users; property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Chapter 242 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-11-3-0) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-5-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |