AZ HB2175 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
City annexation procedure
Title
City annexation procedure
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Crump [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | House majority caucus: Hold | |
2010-04-26 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-26 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-20 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-3-0) | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-22 | House third reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-22 | House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM | |
2010-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-02 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |