AZ HB2175 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Chapter 277 W/O
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Chapter 277 W/O
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public rights-of-way; claims
Title
Public rights-of-way; claims
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] |
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Chapter 277 W/O | |
2015-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-3-0) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate FMFR Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FMFR Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-1-0-2-0) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |