AZ HB2207 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; parking fees
Title
Schools; parking fees
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-20 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2015-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |