AZ HB2212 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal damage; trespassing; critical facilities
Title
Criminal damage; trespassing; critical facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2212 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2212 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-04-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-24-0-0) |
2023-02-21 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-25 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |