AZ HB2220 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Protected person; reports; security freezes
Title
Protected person; reports; security freezes
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. Noel Campbell [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Jay Lawrence [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Rep. Jill Norgaard [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Banking and Financial Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Banking and Financial Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Chapter 280 | |
2015-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-04-01 | House | House final reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate FI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate FI Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FI Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-23-0-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-1-0-2-0) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | House BFS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House BFS Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House BFS Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |