AZ HB2221 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Driver license suspension; photo radar
Title
Driver license suspension; photo radar
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-3-2-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-20 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |