AZ HB2252 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lieutenant governor; duties; ballot
Title
Lieutenant governor; duties; ballot
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |