AZ HB2285 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Refined coal transfer; tax exemptions
Title
Refined coal transfer; tax exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Chapter 54 | |
2014-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-15 | House | House final reading , voting: (58-2-0-0) |
2014-04-15 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-0-1) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-1-1) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-27 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |