AZ HB2322 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Senate ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Senate ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vocational and technical education; evaluations
Title
Vocational and technical education; evaluations
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |