AZ HB2329 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1371
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Air quality; omnibus
Title
Air quality; omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion HB 2329 substituted for SB 1371. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion HB 2329 substituted for SB 1371. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Chapter 27 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2329 substituted for SB 1371. Motion carried. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-5-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1371 (Replaces) 2021-02-09 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 474.04 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 542.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 544 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 553 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 558.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |