AZ HB2330 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
1% property tax limit; GPLET
Title
1% property tax limit; GPLET
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-19 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | House WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Education - Title 15
Gplet
Property - Title 33
Property Tax Oversight Commission
Taxation - Title 42
Education - Title 15
Gplet
Property - Title 33
Property Tax Oversight Commission
Taxation - Title 42
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 15152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |