AZ HB2336 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
City tax code; official copy
Title
City tax code; official copy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-11 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-11 | Senate third reading , voting: (27-0-3-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Consent Calendar March 07, 2011 @ 1:25 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-14 | House third reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-01-25 | House read second time | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in House and read first time |