AZ HB2336 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1274
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Assured water supply; subdivisions
Title
Assured water supply; subdivisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1274 (Replaced by) 2021-02-12 - Chapter 17
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 576.08 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 576.09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 579 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 579.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |