AZ HB2347 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public transportation authorities; board membership
Title
Public transportation authorities; board membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House Higher Education, Innovation and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House Higher Education, Innovation and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-05 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House final reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2012-04-05 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-04 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-04 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-03 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-03 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Consent Calendar March 19, 2012 @ 1:25 PM with Objections | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-09 | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2012-02-01 | House HEIR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House HEIR Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House HEIR Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in House and read first time |