AZ HB2359 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation contracts; indemnity agreements; void
Title
Transportation contracts; indemnity agreements; void
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-05 | Senate third reading , voting: (23-5-2-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Consent Calendar March 28, 2011 @ 1:35 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Senate CE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | House third reading , voting: (52-8-0-0) | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |