AZ HB2376 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of juvenile corrections; continuation
Title
Department of juvenile corrections; continuation
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Ash [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Sen. Catherine Miranda [D] | Rep. Richard Miranda [D] |
Sen. Lynne Pancrazi [D] | Rep. Daniel Patterson [D] | Rep. David Smith [R] | Sen. Anna Tovar [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (53-7-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-12 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-17 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | House third reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-16 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-01-25 | House read second time | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in House and read first time |