AZ HB2409 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PSPRS; pension buyback payments
Title
PSPRS; pension buyback payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-30 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | House final reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2012-04-30 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-24 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-15 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-15 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-06 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-06 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-20 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-20 | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-0-7-0) | |
2012-02-06 | House Consent Calendar February 06, 2012 @ 5:15 PM | |
2012-02-07 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-07 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | House ERA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in House and read first time |