AZ HB2414 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; alternative prosecution; diversion programs
Title
Appropriations; alternative prosecution; diversion programs
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |