AZ HB2443 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Navigable stream adjudication commission; extension
Title
Navigable stream adjudication commission; extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Senate | Chapter 76 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-5-0-0) |
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-24 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |