AZ HB2447 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child safety; department continuation; procedures
Title
Child safety; department continuation; procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Chapter 143 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-04 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (51-7-2-0) |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurs |
2024-04-03 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2024-04-03 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2024-04-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-8-0-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-12-2-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-1-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Child Safety
Child Safety - Title 8 (s)
Child Welfare Agency
Children - Title 8
Continuation
Dcs (see Also: Department Of Child Safety)
Definitions (s)
Department Continuation
Department Of Child Safety (dcs)
Procedures
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Termination (s)
Child Safety - Title 8 (s)
Child Welfare Agency
Children - Title 8
Continuation
Dcs (see Also: Department Of Child Safety)
Definitions (s)
Department Continuation
Department Of Child Safety (dcs)
Procedures
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Termination (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3024.06 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3028.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |