AZ HB2480 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle serial numbers; removal; restoration
Title
Vehicle serial numbers; removal; restoration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 58 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4593 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4594 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |