AZ HB2482 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration changes; text notice
Title
Voter registration changes; text notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2482 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2482 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 73 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-7-3-0) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-2-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-12 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-05 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-05 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Qualification And Registration Of Electors
Text Notice
Voter Registration Changes
Qualification And Registration Of Electors
Text Notice
Voter Registration Changes