AZ HB2485 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Parked vehicles blocking sidewalk; prohibition
Title
Parked vehicles blocking sidewalk; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-12-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |