AZ HB2492 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - House third reading FAILED voting: (23-36-0-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - House third reading FAILED voting: (23-36-0-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Jobs; incentives; credits; grants
Title
Jobs; incentives; credits; grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (23-36-0-1) |
2017-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1507.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1526 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1526.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 13054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1074.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1168 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |