AZ HB2501 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Community college districts; county removal
Title
Community college districts; county removal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |