AZ HB2506 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Foreign agents; registration; attorney general
Title
Foreign agents; registration; attorney general
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-1-0) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-19-3-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriation
Attorney General
Consumer Protection-consumer Fraud Revolving Fund
Country Of Concern
Foreign Agents
Foreign Principals
Registration
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Attorney General
Consumer Protection-consumer Fraud Revolving Fund
Country Of Concern
Foreign Agents
Foreign Principals
Registration
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41