AZ HB2522 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special plates; health sciences; hockey
Title
Special plates; health sciences; hockey
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Rep. Phil Lovas [R] |
Rep. Tony Rivero [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Chapter 124 | |
2015-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-2-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-2-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-20 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-12-3-0) |
2015-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |