AZ HB2522 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic violations; penalties
Title
Traffic violations; penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Syms [R] | Rep. Todd Clodfelter [R] | Rep. Drew John [R] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] |
Rep. Jill Norgaard [R] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] | Rep. Ben Toma [R] | Rep. Jeff Weninger [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 310 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (23-5-2-0) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (46-12-2-0) |
2018-04-19 | House | House Conference adopted |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2018-04-12 | House | House Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments and the bill be further amended. |
2018-04-10 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-10 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conference members: WORSLEY, OTONDO, PETERSEN |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2018-04-05 | House | House Conference members: SYMS, ENGEL, FARNSWORTH E |
2018-04-05 | House | House Conference appointed |
2018-03-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-5-1-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-14 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Community Restitution
Department Of Transportation
Restitution
Traffic Survival School
Traffic Violations
Transportation - Title 28
Department Of Transportation
Restitution
Traffic Survival School
Traffic Violations
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 672 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 676 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |