AZ HB2537 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Charter schools; teachers; funding
Title
Charter schools; teachers; funding
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |