AZ HB2543 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Group foster homes; staffing requirement
Title
Group foster homes; staffing requirement
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Jones [R] | Rep. David Marshall [R] | Rep. Cory McGarr [R] | Rep. Barbara Parker [R] |
Rep. Austin Smith [R] | Sen. Sally Gonzales [D] | Sen. Justine Wadsack [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-6-3-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-3-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |