AZ HB2545 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Homeowners' associations; rental restrictions
Title
Homeowners' associations; rental restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-02-02 | House read second time | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in House and read first time |